House | 02/15/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |