Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to EET/WTL, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 272).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Ohno, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|