Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-Referred to CPN/JDC, GVO/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 41).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-04-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-22 9:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-02-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|