Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 69-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 69-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Tarnas, Johanson, Ilagan, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Misalucha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 5:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 1:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Rhoads, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Johanson, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 798) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3952) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-22 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3458) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ganaden voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Takumi, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|