Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 276).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Lowen, Marten, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Tam; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-22 2:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kitagawa, LoPresti, Lowen, Marten, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Okimoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (6) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|