House | 02/15/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, Ward. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Pending introduction. |