House
|
02/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|