Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022