House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|