Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022