House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-01-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|