Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1959 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1959 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to the minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1959
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 1959
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to the minimum wage.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 PART I SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows: "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; [and] (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016[,]; (4) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2023; and (5) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2024, through December 31, 2024, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage." PART II SECTION 2. Section 387-1, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended as follows: 1. By amending the definition of "wage" to read: ""Wage" means (except as the department may provide under section 387-11) legal tender of the United States or checks on banks convertible into cash on demand at full face value thereof and in addition thereto the reasonable cost as determined by the department, to the employer of furnishing an employee with board, lodging, or other facilities if such board, lodging, or other facilities are customarily furnished by such employer to the employer's employees. [Except for the purposes of the last sentence of section 387-2, "wage"] "Wage" shall not include tips or gratuities of any kind." 2. By deleting the definition of "tipped employee". [""Tipped employee" means any employee engaged in an occupation in which the employee customarily and regularly receives more than $20 a month in tips."] SECTION 3. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. [(a)] Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. [(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.]" PART III SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022; provided that part II shall take effect on January 1, 2025. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 PART I
5050
5151 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (b) to read as follows:
5252
5353 "(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
5454
5555 (1) 25 cents;
5656
5757 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; [and]
5858
5959 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016[,];
6060
6161 (4) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2023; and
6262
6363 (5) 25 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2024, through December 31, 2024,
6464
6565 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage."
6666
6767 PART II
6868
6969 SECTION 2. Section 387-1, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended as follows:
7070
7171 1. By amending the definition of "wage" to read:
7272
7373 ""Wage" means (except as the department may provide under section 387-11) legal tender of the United States or checks on banks convertible into cash on demand at full face value thereof and in addition thereto the reasonable cost as determined by the department, to the employer of furnishing an employee with board, lodging, or other facilities if such board, lodging, or other facilities are customarily furnished by such employer to the employer's employees. [Except for the purposes of the last sentence of section 387-2, "wage"] "Wage" shall not include tips or gratuities of any kind."
7474
7575 2. By deleting the definition of "tipped employee".
7676
7777 [""Tipped employee" means any employee engaged in an occupation in which the employee customarily and regularly receives more than $20 a month in tips."]
7878
7979 SECTION 3. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows:
8080
8181 "§387-2 Minimum wages. [(a)] Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than:
8282
8383 (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003;
8484
8585 (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006;
8686
8787 (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007;
8888
8989 (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015;
9090
9191 (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016;
9292
9393 (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and
9494
9595 (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018.
9696
9797 [(b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
9898
9999 (1) 25 cents;
100100
101101 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and
102102
103103 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016,
104104
105105 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.]"
106106
107107 PART III
108108
109109 SECTION 4. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
110110
111111 SECTION 5. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022; provided that part II shall take effect on January 1, 2025.
112112
113113
114114
115115 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
116116
117117 INTRODUCED BY:
118118
119119 _____________________________
120120
121121
122122
123123
124124
125125 Report Title: Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Adjustment; Repeal Description: Adjusts the tip credit beginning on 1/1/2023. Repeals the tip credit on 1/1/2025. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
126126
127127
128128
129129
130130
131131 Report Title:
132132
133133 Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Adjustment; Repeal
134134
135135
136136
137137 Description:
138138
139139 Adjusts the tip credit beginning on 1/1/2023. Repeals the tip credit on 1/1/2025.
140140
141141
142142
143143
144144
145145
146146
147147 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.