House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, McDermott, Todd, Tokioka, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-04-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|