Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022