Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1980 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022