House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 217, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 217, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-22 10:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Riviere, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 813) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3937) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 291).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|