House | 02/18/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 11 | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to ECD/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |