House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to AGR, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|