House | 02/07/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to ECD, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |