LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2004
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HB2004
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HB2004
Action History
House
02/04/2022
The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
02/02/2022
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
House
01/28/2022
Referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
House
01/26/2022
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
House
01/24/2022
Pending introduction.