Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Re-Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-01-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|