12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/04/2021 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |