House | 02/17/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |