House | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-22 11:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-22. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |