Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN/HTH/CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Marten, Matayoshi, Okimoto, Onishi, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Tarnas voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Onishi, Tarnas; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Clark, Har, LoPresti, Matayoshi, Sayama, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten, Nakamura, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka, Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Nakamura; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Re-referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|