12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/11/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Belatti, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 02-08-21 2:00PM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Re-referred to LMG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 4 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to LMG, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |