Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 735).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 734) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3753) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to EET, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 57).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|