Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 59).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|