Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 68).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|