House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|