House | 02/15/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |