House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 058, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 058, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-22 1:45PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chang, Riviere, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 383).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 573) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-31-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|