House | 02/14/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2). | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Clark, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Quinlan. | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 2). | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Pending introduction. |