House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 126, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 126, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Deferred one day 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 815).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Acasio Chair; Keohokalole, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Ihara, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 829) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3913) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 183).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-02-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|