House | 02/17/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:45AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Pending introduction. |