Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|