House | 02/09/2022 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Okimoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Pending introduction. |