Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to HOU, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-25-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-10-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|