Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022