Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|