Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|