House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 061, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 061, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Deferred one day 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 815).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 807).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Kapela, Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Re-referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 49
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 840) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3959) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 79).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 687-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-25-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Clark.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|