House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Re-referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 15
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to CAI, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|