Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3504), as amended (SD 2), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-Referred to AEN, EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 199).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-22 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 298-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|