1 | 1 | | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2292 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to the minimum wage. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 2292 |
---|
4 | 4 | | THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 |
---|
5 | 5 | | STATE OF HAWAII |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | H.B. NO. |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | 2292 |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | STATE OF HAWAII |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | |
---|
31 | 31 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT |
---|
32 | 32 | | |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | relating to the minimum wage. |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII: |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; [and] (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018[.]; and (8) $18.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2023; provided that this paragraph shall only apply to employers with more than fifteen employees." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; [and] |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018[.]; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | (8) $18.00 per hour beginning January 1, 2023; provided that this paragraph shall only apply to employers with more than fifteen employees." |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________ |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | INTRODUCED BY: |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | _____________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | |
---|
84 | 84 | | |
---|
85 | 85 | | Report Title: Minimum Wage; Increase; Exception Description: Increases the minimum wage to $18 an hour, effective January 1, 2023, for employees employed by an employer with more than fifteen employees. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. |
---|
86 | 86 | | |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | |
---|
89 | 89 | | |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | Report Title: |
---|
92 | 92 | | |
---|
93 | 93 | | Minimum Wage; Increase; Exception |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | Description: |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | Increases the minimum wage to $18 an hour, effective January 1, 2023, for employees employed by an employer with more than fifteen employees. |
---|
100 | 100 | | |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | |
---|
103 | 103 | | |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. |
---|