House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|