House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 211, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 211, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 847) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to WTL/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 287-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|