House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 042, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 042, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 849) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3846) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
The committee on JDC will reconsider its previous decision on 03-18-22 and will hold a public decision making on 04-06-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|