House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 063, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 063, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 745).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 738) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-01-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|