House | 02/17/2022 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |